Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abduction

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0683)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0701 /CH0420 (SB0454/CH0168)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1186
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187
Title
Crimes - Trafficking of Human Organs - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0454 /CH0168 (HB0701/CH0420)
Title
Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509
Title
Income Tax Credit - Returning Heroes and Wounded Warriors
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0185)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 (SB0683) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 /CH0116 (SB0337/CH0115) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0701 /CH0420 (SB0454/CH0168) Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty Delegate Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1186 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Charge by Summons Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 3:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2014 - 3:30 PM
HB1187 Crimes - Trafficking of Human Organs - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0337 /CH0115 (HB0306/CH0116) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0454 /CH0168 (HB0701/CH0420) Criminal Law - Child Kidnapping for the Purpose of Committing a Sexual Crime - Penalty Senator Robey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 Income Tax Credit - Returning Heroes and Wounded Warriors Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0185) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM