Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Abortion

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0216 (SB0289)
Title
Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0749)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357
Title
Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0007
Title
Commencement of Life of the Human Person at Conception
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0289 (HB0216)
Title
Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626
Title
Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options (Full Medical Disclosure Act)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 (HB0603)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Data Collection and Use - Pregnancy Rates
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0216 (SB0289) Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0749) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1357 Public Health - State Funding for Abortions - Prohibition and Exceptions Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HJ0007 Commencement of Life of the Human Person at Conception Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0289 (HB0216) Public Health - Preventive Medical Care - Consent by Minors Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options (Full Medical Disclosure Act) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0749 (HB0603) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0793 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Data Collection and Use - Pregnancy Rates Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM
Click to return on the top page