Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0261
Title
Juvenile Causes - Disposition on Delinquency Petition - Required Considerations
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0265
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 (SB0430)
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0472)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0583 (SB0283/CH0546)
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086
Title
Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of the Inspector General - Establishment PG 421-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220 /CH0136
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262 (SB0829)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396 (SB0960)
Title
Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Angel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586 (SB0722)
Title
Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0059
Title
Criminal Law - Aggravated Cruelty to Animals in the Presence of a Minor
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0264
Title
Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 /CH0546 (HB0583)
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0430 (HB0512)
Title
Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 (HB0580)
Title
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB1586)
Title
Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 (HB1262)
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 (HB1396)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0261 Juvenile Causes - Disposition on Delinquency Petition - Required Considerations Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0265 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Care Facilities - Abuser Registry Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0279 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Abuser Registry Workgroup Recommendations - Report Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2016 - 3:00 PM
HB0512 (SB0430) Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights Delegate Kittleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 (SB0472) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Economic Matters
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0583 (SB0283/CH0546) Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1086 Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of the Inspector General - Establishment PG 421-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 /CH0136 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Health Program Integrity and Recovery Activities Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1262 (SB0829) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Delegate Oaks 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1396 (SB0960) Domestic Violence - Education and Definition of Abuse Delegate Angel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1586 (SB0722) Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory Reporting Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0059 Criminal Law - Aggravated Cruelty to Animals in the Presence of a Minor Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0264 Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False Representation Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0283 /CH0546 (HB0583) Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Implement of Dogfighting Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0430 (HB0512) Guardianship of a Disabled Person - Communication and Notification Rights Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0472 (HB0580) Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families Act Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0722 (HB1586) Crimes Related to Animals - Penalties - Mandatory Reporting Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0829 (HB1262) Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board Senator Conway 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0960 (HB1396) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM