Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Abuse -see also- Child Abuse & Neg.; Elder Abuse & Neg., etc

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040
Title
Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0211
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Teachers and Administrators - Child Protective Services Investigation Findings PG 510-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 (SB1038/CH0238)
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing Conditions
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565
Title
Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0599
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134 (SB0800)
Title
Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1238 (SB1203)
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1303 /CH0425 (SB0491/CH0426)
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1629
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1822
Title
Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department
Sponsor
Delegate Ali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1824
Title
Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214
Title
Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 /CH0454
Title
Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0491 /CH0426 (HB1303/CH0425)
Title
Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0800 (HB1134)
Title
Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1038 /CH0238 (HB0212)
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing Conditions
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1203 (HB1238)
Title
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 Criminal Law and Procedure - Animal Abuse Registry Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0211 Prince George's County Board of Education - Teachers and Administrators - Child Protective Services Investigation Findings PG 510-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 (SB1038/CH0238) Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing Conditions Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0565 Criminal Law - Cruelty to Animals - Seizure and Removal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0599 Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Coercive Control Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 Criminal Law – Cruelty to Animals – Traveling Elephant Acts Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 (SB0800) Criminal Law – Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices – Sexual Activity With an Animal Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1238 (SB1203) Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program Delegate Hettleman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/01/2018 - 1:15 PM
HB1303 /CH0425 (SB0491/CH0426) Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Protective Orders Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1629 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1822 Task Force to Study the Baltimore Police Department Delegate Ali 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1824 Prince George's County - Marriage License Fees - Distribution of Proceeds PG 433-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 Task Force to Study the Need for Enhanced Monitoring of Guardians of Vulnerable Adults Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0386 /CH0454 Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018 Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Finance
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0491 /CH0426 (HB1303/CH0425) Family Law – Domestic Violence – Permanent Protective Orders Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 426
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0800 (HB1134) Criminal Law – Sexual Activity With an Animal, Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practices, and Sodomy Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1038 /CH0238 (HB0212) Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing Conditions Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1203 (HB1238) Higher Education - Sexual Assault Response Training - Requirements and Grant Program Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM