Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accidents

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0868)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1281
Title
State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public Access
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465
Title
Civil Actions - Motor Vehicle Accidents Involving Pedestrians or Nonmotorized Vehicles - Comparative Negligence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0499
Title
Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1099)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1150
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1099 (SB0868) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1281 State Highway Administration - Project Planning Documents - Public Access Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0465 Civil Actions - Motor Vehicle Accidents Involving Pedestrians or Nonmotorized Vehicles - Comparative Negligence Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0499 Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0868 (HB1099) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1150 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM