Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Accountants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0423 (SB0394)
Title
St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192
Title
Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0394 (HB0243/CH0423)
Title
St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0243 /CH0423 (SB0394) St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - Repeal St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0726 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0192 Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0394 (HB0243/CH0423) St. Mary's County - Auditing Requirements - Repeal Senator Waugh 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM