Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Administrative Hearings, Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0555)
Title
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0556)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0555 (HB0330)
Title
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB1112)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0330 (SB0555) Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 (SB0556) Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0555 (HB0330) Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work Contracts Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 (HB1112) Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page