Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Hearings, Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0628 /CH0613 (SB0517/CH0614)
Title
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Departments
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1046
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 /CH0702
Title
Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1265 /CH0218 (SB0549/CH0217)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 (SB0877)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0517 /CH0614 (HB0628/CH0613)
Title
Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Departments
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0549 /CH0217 (HB1265/CH0218)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1347)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0936
Title
Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1180
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0628 /CH0613 (SB0517/CH0614) Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Departments Delegate Barron 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1046 Residential Property - Foreclosure Process - Filing Requirements - Mediation Procedures Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 /CH0702 Vehicle Laws - Victim's Representative Notification - License Suspension Hearing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 702
Judiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1265 /CH0218 (SB0549/CH0217) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1347 (SB0877) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2017 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1515 Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0517 /CH0614 (HB0628/CH0613) Secretaries of Principal Departments - Supervision and Review of Decisions and Actions by Units Within Departments Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0549 /CH0217 (HB1265/CH0218) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1347) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0936 Residential Property - Foreclosure Timelines and Procedures Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1180 Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM