Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Hearings, Office of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819 /CH0253 (SB0741)
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909 (SB0862)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0819/CH0253)
Title
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB0909)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0819 /CH0253 (SB0741) Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0909 (SB0862) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0741 (HB0819/CH0253) Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – Appeals Senator Madaleno 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0862 (HB0909) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM