Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0032)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 (SB0390/CH0493)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0912 /CH0242 (SB0924)
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 (SB0698/CH0191)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273 (SB0986)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB0824)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1328 (SB0865/CH0567)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0032 (HB0108)
Title
Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0390 /CH0493 (HB0386)
Title
Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points
Sponsor
Baltimore City Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698 /CH0191 (HB1161)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1292)
Title
District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 /CH0567 (HB1328)
Title
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0924 (HB0912/CH0242)
Title
Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1273)
Title
Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0032) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judiciary Committee 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0386 (SB0390/CH0493) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points Delegate Anderson 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0912 /CH0242 (SB0924) Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1161 (SB0698/CH0191) Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1273 (SB0986) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 (SB0824) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Delegate Jones 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1328 (SB0865/CH0567) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights Delegate Swain 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environmental Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0032 (HB0108) Circuit Court Real Property Records Improvement Fund - Funding Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0390 /CH0493 (HB0386) Criminal Law - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Driver's License - Points Baltimore City Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 /CH0191 (HB1161) Criminal Procedure - Electronic Device Location Information - Order Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 191
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB1292) District Court of Maryland Employees - Collective Bargaining Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0865 /CH0567 (HB1328) Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member Rights Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 567
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0924 (HB0912/CH0242) Courts - Electronic Communications - Privacy Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0986 (HB1273) Criminal Law - Energy Drinks - Sale to and Possession by Minors Prohibited Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM