Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Administrative Office of the Courts

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0328)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 /CH0664 (SB0266/CH0663)
Title
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 (SB0849)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 /CH0663 (HB0410/CH0664)
Title
Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327
Title
Natural Resources Police - Conditions of Sentencing, Probation, Parole, or Mandatory Release Supervision - Database
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 (HB0814)
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1106 /CH0467
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0220 (SB0328) Criminal Procedure - Partial Expungement Delegate Barron 2 2 In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0410 /CH0664 (SB0266/CH0663) Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016 Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0814 (SB0849) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
SB0266 /CH0663 (HB0410/CH0664) Natural Resources - Poaching Restitution Act of 2016 Senator Salling 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0327 Natural Resources Police - Conditions of Sentencing, Probation, Parole, or Mandatory Release Supervision - Database Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0849 (HB0814) Task Force to Study the Establishment of Health Courts Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
SB1106 /CH0467 Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 467
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM