Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Admissions and Amusement Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1206
Title
Baltimore County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Classes and Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227 /CH0216 (SB0499/CH0215)
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292
Title
Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for Refund
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0499 /CH0215 (HB1227/CH0216)
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0659
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0595
Title
Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0162 Comptroller - Taxpayer Protection Act Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1206 Baltimore County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Classes and Rates Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 /CH0216 (SB0499/CH0215) Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0292 Tax Assessments - Appeals Procedures - Application for Revision or Claim for Refund Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0499 /CH0215 (HB1227/CH0216) Admissions and Amusement Tax - Baltimore City - Amateur Sports League Fees Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0659 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 /CH0595 Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming Licenses Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM