Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Admissions and Amusement Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0272
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax – Baltimore County – Fees for Nonprofit Amateur Sports League
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0983 /CH0557
Title
Maryland Historical Society - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0272 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0549 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0824 Admissions and Amusement Tax – Baltimore County – Fees for Nonprofit Amateur Sports League Delegate West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0457 Sales and Use Tax - Rate Reduction Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0983 /CH0557 Maryland Historical Society - Funding Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM