Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Adoption

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 /CH0086
Title
Family Law - Adoption, Search, Contact, and Reunion Services - Relatives of Minors in Out-of-Home Placement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0689 (SB0599)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0411)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 (SB0862)
Title
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1474
Title
Baltimore County - Division of Animal Control - Treatment of Unclaimed Dogs or Cats
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0411 (HB0958)
Title
Rape Survivor Family Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599 (HB0689)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681
Title
Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334)
Title
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0862 (HB1347)
Title
Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0912
Title
Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1093
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 /CH0086 Family Law - Adoption, Search, Contact, and Reunion Services - Relatives of Minors in Out-of-Home Placement Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0689 (SB0599) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0958 (SB0411) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1026 /CH0334 (SB0737/CH0333) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1347 (SB0862) Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1358 Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1474 Baltimore County - Division of Animal Control - Treatment of Unclaimed Dogs or Cats Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0411 (HB0958) Rape Survivor Family Protection Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0599 (HB0689) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 Department of Human Resources - Contracts for Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 /CH0333 (HB1026/CH0334) Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a Child Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Finance
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0862 (HB1347) Animal Welfare - Research Facilities - Dogs and Cats Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0912 Maryland Animal Abuse Registry Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1093 State Finance and Procurement - Legal Services Delivery Organization to Provide State-Mandated Legal Services Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM