Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Adoption

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167 (SB0578)
Title
Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0494 /CH0267
Title
Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0909
Title
Task Force to Study Paid Parental Leave Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0976
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Police Dogs
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477
Title
Gestational Agreements - Rights of Parties
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1484 (SB0015)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0015 (HB1484)
Title
Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 (HB0167)
Title
Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for Relief
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573)
Title
Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0704
Title
CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 /CH0423
Title
CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1156
Title
Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 (SB0578) Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for Relief Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0494 /CH0267 Agriculture - Animal Shelters - Uniform Standards of Operation and Care (Animal Shelters Standards Act of 2016) Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 Humane Adoption of Companion Animals Used in Research Act of 2016 Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0909 Task Force to Study Paid Parental Leave Policies Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0976 CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1113 /CH0573 (SB0663/CH0572) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 573
Economic Matters
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Income Tax Credit - Veterinary Services for Adopted Police Dogs Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 Income Tax Credit - Cat and Dog Adoption Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1477 Gestational Agreements - Rights of Parties Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1484 (SB0015) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0015 (HB1484) Child Placement - Prohibition on Human Trafficking, Restrictions on Advertising, and Reporting Requirements Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 (HB0167) Domestic Violence - Person Eligible for Relief Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 /CH0572 (HB1113/CH0573) Commercial Sale of Dogs and Cats - Prohibited Acts (Companion Animal Welfare Act) Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 572
Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0704 CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0765 /CH0423 CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or Party Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 423
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1156 Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public Defender Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM