Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0167
Title
Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1213
Title
Family Law - Guardianship and Adoption - Age of Consent and Revocation of Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438)
Title
Family Law - Parentage and Adoption
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0167 Juvenile Causes - Safe Haven Newborns Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 /CH0438 (SB0697/CH0437) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1213 Family Law - Guardianship and Adoption - Age of Consent and Revocation of Consent Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0437 (HB0519/CH0438) Family Law - Parentage and Adoption Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM