Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

AELR Committee

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0939 /CH0137 (SB0775)
Title
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058)
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB0939/CH0137)
Title
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0067 /CH0058 (SB0220) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 58
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2015 - 3:00 PM
Rules
HB0939 /CH0137 (SB0775) Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 137
Economic Matters
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
SB0220 (HB0067/CH0058) General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies President 6 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0775 (HB0939/CH0137) Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small Businesses President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2015 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM