Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Age of Majority -see also- Minors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Harford County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004 (SB0313)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Individuals at Special Entertainment Events PG 319-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 /CH0117
Title
Video Lottery Facility - Areas Prohibited to Individuals Under the Age of 21 Years - Employee Exception
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
Legal Drinking Age - Active Duty Members of the Armed Forces
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313 (HB1004)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Individuals at Special Entertainment Events in the 47th Legislative District
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0322 Harford County - Charitable Gaming Harford County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1004 (SB0313) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Individuals at Special Entertainment Events PG 319-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Economic Matters
HB1111 /CH0117 Video Lottery Facility - Areas Prohibited to Individuals Under the Age of 21 Years - Employee Exception Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Ways and Means
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1152 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0213 Legal Drinking Age - Active Duty Members of the Armed Forces Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0313 (HB1004) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Individuals at Special Entertainment Events in the 47th Legislative District Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM