Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Age of Majority -see also- Minors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0085 /CH0474
Title
Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0350
Title
Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing Act
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642 /CH0012 (SB0505/CH0656)
Title
Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0955
Title
Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 (SB0891)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and Cultivate
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1445 (SB0775)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1555
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Service
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0775 (HB1445)
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tobacconist License
Sponsor
Harford County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0891 (HB1236)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and Cultivate
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0913 /CH0277 (HB1122/CH0278)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1006
Title
Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0085 /CH0474 Anne Arundel County - Charitable Gaming Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0350 Montgomery County - Gaming - Bingo Games MC 16-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 Baltimore County - Freedom in Brewing Act Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0642 /CH0012 (SB0505/CH0656) Civil Actions - Child Sexual Abuse - Statute of Limitations and Required Findings Delegate Wilson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Judiciary
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0955 Family Law - Age of Majority - Jurisdiction of Court Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 (SB0891) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and Cultivate Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1445 (SB0775) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cigar Shop Licenses Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1555 Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Service Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0775 (HB1445) Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Tobacconist License Harford County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0891 (HB1236) Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Right to Use, Possess, and Cultivate Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0913 /CH0277 (HB1122/CH0278) State Retirement and Pension System - Death Benefits Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 277
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 8:30 AM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1006 Senior Citizen Activities Centers - Bingo Games - Authorization Senator Jennings 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM