Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221 (SB0079/CH0015)
Title
Limited Lines - Travel Insurance
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0268
Title
Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Home Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 /CH0226
Title
Privileged Communications - Dissemination of News or Information by Certain Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0412 (SB0229)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0487)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0319 (SB0624/CH0318)
Title
Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0421
Title
Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 (SB0820)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 (SB0999/CH0366)
Title
Insurance - Reinsurance - Certification of Reinsurers
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0079 /CH0015 (HB0221)
Title
Limited Lines - Travel Insurance
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097 /CH0024
Title
Insurance - Public Adjusters - Prohibited Inducements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0026
Title
Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal Actions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0108 /CH0131
Title
State Lottery - Unlawful Representation
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0280
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229 (HB0412)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0574)
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 /CH0318 (HB0679/CH0319)
Title
Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 (HB1080)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 /CH0366 (HB1465)
Title
Insurance - Reinsurance - Certification of Reinsurers
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0221 (SB0079/CH0015) Limited Lines - Travel Insurance Delegate Rudolph 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0268 Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company Representative Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0366 Home Act of 2014 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0385 /CH0226 Privileged Communications - Dissemination of News or Information by Certain Persons Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 226
Judiciary
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0412 (SB0229) Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0574 (SB0487) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Delegate Jameson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0319 (SB0624/CH0318) Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0723 /CH0421 Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - Requirements Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 (SB0820) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1465 (SB0999/CH0366) Insurance - Reinsurance - Certification of Reinsurers Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0079 /CH0015 (HB0221) Limited Lines - Travel Insurance Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 15
Finance
1/22/2014 - 1:45 PM
Economic Matters
SB0097 /CH0024 Insurance - Public Adjusters - Prohibited Inducements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 24
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 /CH0026 Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal Actions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0108 /CH0131 State Lottery - Unlawful Representation Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0226 /CH0280 Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permit Senator Pinsky 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 (HB0412) Real Property - Condominiums - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit - Limitation on Fees Senator Frosh 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0574) Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0624 /CH0318 (HB0679/CH0319) Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0820 (HB1080) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Sales - Disclosure and Cancellation Requirements Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0999 /CH0366 (HB1465) Insurance - Reinsurance - Certification of Reinsurers Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM