Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aging, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257
Title
Department of Aging - Contract Review
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1618 (SB0939)
Title
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0004 /CH0473
Title
Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 (HB1618)
Title
Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 Department of Aging - Contract Review Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1618 (SB0939) Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0004 /CH0473 Oversight Committee on Quality of Care in Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities – Revisions Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Finance
2/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0939 (HB1618) Community-Based Services Waivers and State Disabilities Plan - Alterations (Maryland Disabilities Act) Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM