Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aging, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 /CH0308 (SB0279/CH0309)
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571 /CH0410 (SB0522/CH0411)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0279 /CH0309 (HB0251/CH0308)
Title
Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA")
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 /CH0411 (HB0571/CH0410)
Title
Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0251 /CH0308 (SB0279/CH0309) Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA") Delegate Hill 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0571 /CH0410 (SB0522/CH0411) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0279 /CH0309 (HB0251/CH0308) Department of Aging - Grants for Aging-in-Place Programs (Nonprofits for our Aging Neighbors Act - "NANA") Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Finance
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0522 /CH0411 (HB0571/CH0410) Virginia I. Jones Alzheimer's Disease and Related Disorders Council - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM