Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Agriculture, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400 (SB0364)
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433 (SB0412)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767 /CH0562 (SB0820/CH0561)
Title
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0775 /CH0524 (SB0675/CH0523)
Title
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1017 /CH0659
Title
Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1327 /CH0151
Title
Agricultural Commodity - Assessment - Collection
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453
Title
Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0038
Title
Income Tax - Tax Credit for Wineries and Vineyards
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0053 /CH0171
Title
Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested Cases
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 /CH0027
Title
Department of Agriculture - State Chemist Fund
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0364 (HB0400)
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0433)
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0675 /CH0523 (HB0775/CH0524)
Title
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739
Title
Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Fertility Index Value Soil Testing
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0820 /CH0561 (HB0767/CH0562)
Title
Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Benson
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0970
Title
Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029 /CH0339
Title
Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0400 (SB0364) Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0433 (SB0412) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0767 /CH0562 (SB0820/CH0561) Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - Establishment Delegate Frush 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0775 /CH0524 (SB0675/CH0523) Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1017 /CH0659 Income Tax Credit - Wineries and Vineyards Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 659
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1327 /CH0151 Agricultural Commodity - Assessment - Collection Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1453 Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and Taxation Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0038 Income Tax - Tax Credit for Wineries and Vineyards Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0053 /CH0171 Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested Cases Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 171
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0180 /CH0027 Department of Agriculture - State Chemist Fund Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 27
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0364 (HB0400) Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0412 (HB0433) Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0675 /CH0523 (HB0775/CH0524) Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information Workgroup Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB0739 Agriculture - Nutrient Management Plans - Fertility Index Value Soil Testing Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0820 /CH0561 (HB0767/CH0562) Animal Welfare - Spay/Neuter Fund - Establishment Senator Benson 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0970 Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - Compensation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1029 /CH0339 Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM