Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Agriculture, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0193 (SB0027)
Title
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284 (SB0963)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Delegate Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0576
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0414
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Market Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795
Title
Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0880 (SB0658)
Title
Marijuana Control Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010
Title
Agriculture - Production and Sale of Industrial Hemp
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076 (SB0521)
Title
Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1083 (SB0670)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Gleaning
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1472
Title
Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0027 (HB0193)
Title
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0127 /CH0036
Title
Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation Project
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513
Title
Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0521 (HB1076)
Title
Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative Program
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB0880)
Title
The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 (HB1083)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Gleaning
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963 (HB0284)
Title
Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0193 (SB0027) Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0284 (SB0963) Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis Delegate Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0576 Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Diminution in Value of Real Property - Compensation Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 /CH0414 Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' Market Permit - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 414
Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0795 Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0880 (SB0658) Marijuana Control Act of 2014 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1010 Agriculture - Production and Sale of Industrial Hemp Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1076 (SB0521) Energy-Generating Cooperative Advisory Committee Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1083 (SB0670) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Gleaning Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1472 Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - Study Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0027 (HB0193) Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0127 /CH0036 Department of Agriculture - Manure Transportation Project Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2014 - 3:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0513 Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0521 (HB1076) Poultry Litter Energy-Generating Cooperative Program Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
SB0658 (HB0880) The Marijuana Taxation and Regulation Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0670 (HB1083) Income Tax Credit - Qualified Farms - Gleaning Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0963 (HB0284) Department of Agriculture - Phosphorus Assessment and Management - Study and Economic Impact Analysis Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1092 Health General - Milk Products - Direct-to-Consumer Sale of Raw Milk Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM