Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Aircraft

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 (SB0019/CH0164)
Title
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0827)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1004 (SB0774/CH0546)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0744)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bohrer Park Miniature Golf Course
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233
Title
Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of Drones
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0164 (HB0012)
Title
Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0546 (HB1004)
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0660)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation Museum
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429)
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 (SB0019/CH0164) Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft Delegate Arora 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
1/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0660 (SB0827) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1004 (SB0774/CH0546) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1007 (SB0744) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Bohrer Park Miniature Golf Course Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB1233 Criminal Procedure - Law Enforcement Agencies - Use of Drones Delegate George 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1515 /CH0429 (SB1054) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0019 /CH0164 (HB0012) Crimes - Aiming Laser Pointer at Aircraft Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 164
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0546 (HB1004) Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB0660) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1050 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - College Park Aviation Museum Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB1054 (HB1515/CH0429) Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM