Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alimony

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0191
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0759
Title
Home Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Family Law - Automatic Injunction
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0191 Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0759 Home Act of 2016 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1120 Family Law - Automatic Injunction Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM