Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155 (SB0642)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 (SB0722)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0320 (SB0253)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0330 (SB0643/CH0190)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0515 /CH0255 (SB0644)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Class B-MB (Micro-Brewery/Restaurant) License
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525 (SB0348)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0590
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction - Allegany County and Washington County
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690
Title
Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities)
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957
Title
Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumption - Duty Belt Worn by Law Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1089 (SB0196)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 (SB0824)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1150 (SB0825)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Facilities - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196 (HB1089)
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0320)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 (HB0525)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0642 (HB0155)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0643 /CH0190 (HB0330)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0644 (HB0515/CH0255)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Class B-MB (Micro-Brewery/Restaurant) License
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0722 (HB0178)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 (HB1142)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0825 (HB1150)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Facilities - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0155 (SB0642) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0178 (SB0722) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB0320 (SB0253) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 3:00 PM
HB0330 (SB0643/CH0190) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0515 /CH0255 (SB0644) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Class B-MB (Micro-Brewery/Restaurant) License Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0525 (SB0348) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0590 Corporate Income Tax - Rate Reduction - Allegany County and Washington County Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0690 Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities) Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 Workers' Compensation - Occupational Disease Presumption - Duty Belt Worn by Law Enforcement Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB1089 (SB0196) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1142 (SB0824) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany County - Warrant Intercept Program Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1150 (SB0825) Allegany County - Video Lottery Facilities - Distribution of Proceeds Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0196 (HB1089) Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0253 (HB0320) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Allegany County Animal Shelter Adoption and Care Center Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0348 (HB0525) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Special Beer Festival License Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0642 (HB0155) Video Lottery Terminals - Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account - Use of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0643 /CH0190 (HB0330) Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Additional License Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 190
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0644 (HB0515/CH0255) Alcoholic Beverages - Allegany County - Class B-MB (Micro-Brewery/Restaurant) License Senator Edwards 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0722 (HB0178) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Frostburg Museum Relocation Project Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0824 (HB1142) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Allegany County - Warrant Intercept Program Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0825 (HB1150) Allegany County - Video Lottery Facilities - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM