Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091 (SB0495/CH0339)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 (SB0592/CH0693)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Frostburg Museum Association
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 (SB0662)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Coal Miner Memorial Statue
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809 (SB0638)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Cumberland YMCA Youth Center
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811 /CH0472 (SB0663)
Title
Allegany County and Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 (SB0639/CH0471)
Title
Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB1047)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0923 /CH0470
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0930 (SB0640)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0145
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales and Privileges
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0495 /CH0339 (HB0091)
Title
Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact Grants
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0592 /CH0693 (HB0681)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0809)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Cumberland YMCA Youth Center
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0639 /CH0471 (HB0858)
Title
Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0930)
Title
Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 (HB0805)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Coal Miner Memorial Statue
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB0811/CH0472)
Title
Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensee
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1047 (HB0864)
Title
Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0091 (SB0495/CH0339) Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0681 (SB0592/CH0693) Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Frostburg Museum Association Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 (SB0662) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Coal Miner Memorial Statue Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB0809 (SB0638) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Cumberland YMCA Youth Center Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 4:00 PM
HB0811 /CH0472 (SB0663) Allegany County and Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0858 (SB0639/CH0471) Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0864 (SB1047) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0923 /CH0470 Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0930 (SB0640) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1096 /CH0145 Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales and Privileges Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0495 /CH0339 (HB0091) Gaming - Video Lottery Terminals - Transfer of Ownership and Local Impact Grants Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0592 /CH0693 (HB0681) Allegany County - Property Tax Credits - Community Organizations and Lions Center Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 693
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2017 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0809) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Cumberland YMCA Youth Center Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0639 /CH0471 (HB0858) Allegany County - Sheriff's Deputies - Salary and Duties Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0930) Municipalities and Counties - Local Roads - Regulation of Travel by Heavy-Weight Vehicles Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0662 (HB0805) Creation of a State Debt - Allegany County - Coal Miner Memorial Statue Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0663 (HB0811/CH0472) Allegany County - Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensee Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1047 (HB0864) Distribution of Marriage Ceremony Fees Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM