Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Allegany County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053 (SB0131)
Title
County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0117 (SB0214/CH0118)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 /CH0115 (SB0215/CH0116)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 (SB0437)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0070 (SB0099/CH0071)
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866 /CH0699 (SB0667/CH0700)
Title
Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146 (SB0664)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378 (SB0293)
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430 (SB1050)
Title
Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0071 (HB0639/CH0070)
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0131 (HB0053)
Title
County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214 /CH0118 (HB0243/CH0117)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215 /CH0116 (HB0276/CH0115)
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0293 (HB1378)
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0437 (HB0538)
Title
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1146)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0667 /CH0700 (HB0866/CH0699)
Title
Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
Community Development - Rural Maryland Opportunity Zone Fund
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1050 (HB1430)
Title
Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts
Sponsor
Minority Leader
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 (SB0131) County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0243 /CH0117 (SB0214/CH0118) Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0276 /CH0115 (SB0215/CH0116) Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation Allegany County Delegation 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0340 State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act) Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0538 (SB0437) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0639 /CH0070 (SB0099/CH0071) Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0866 /CH0699 (SB0667/CH0700) Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1146 (SB0664) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
HB1378 (SB0293) Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds Delegate Anderton 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1430 (SB1050) Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts Minority Leader 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0099 /CH0071 (HB0639/CH0070) Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0131 (HB0053) County Boards of Education - Length of School Year - Adjustments Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0214 /CH0118 (HB0243/CH0117) Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2019 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0215 /CH0116 (HB0276/CH0115) Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0293 (HB1378) Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Migratory Game Birds Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0437 (HB0538) Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB1146) Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0667 /CH0700 (HB0866/CH0699) Allegany County – Alcoholic Beverages – Licenses Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0756 Community Development - Rural Maryland Opportunity Zone Fund Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1050 (HB1430) Congressional Districting Plan - Sixth and Eighth Congressional Districts Minority Leader 3 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM