Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259 (SB0207)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207 (HB0259)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052)
Title
Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0259 (SB0207) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 (SB0805/CH0342) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0207 (HB0259) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0805 /CH0342 (HB1052) Maryland Uniform Collaborative Law Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 342
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM