Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0220 (SB0273)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0405 (SB0374/CH0165)
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0738 /CH0271
Title
Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0570)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1172 /CH0470
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0143
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Notice of Intent
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 (HB0220)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0374 /CH0165 (HB0405)
Title
Maryland False Claims Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0399
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0829)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0220 (SB0273) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0405 (SB0374/CH0165) Maryland False Claims Act Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0547 Medical Liability Efficiency Act of 2015 Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0738 /CH0271 Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in Procurement Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 271
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 (SB0570) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1060 Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated Meetings Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1172 /CH0470 Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/13/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0143 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Notice of Intent Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0252 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 (HB0220) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0374 /CH0165 (HB0405) Maryland False Claims Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0399 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0570 (HB0829) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM