Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Alternative Energy Sources

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 /CH0364 (SB0313/CH0365)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442
Title
Volkswagen Settlement Funds - Use of Environmental Mitigation Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0514 /CH0780 (SB0184/CH0014)
Title
Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0699 (SB0301)
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0863
Title
State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm)
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0867
Title
Natural Resources - State-Owned Land - Wind Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Solar Energy Grant Program - Energy Storage
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1414 /CH0393 (SB1146)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512 (SB0942)
Title
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1543
Title
Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Installing Solar Panels on Baltimore City Public Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1548 (SB0926)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Property
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0174
Title
Income Tax Credit - Clean Energy Production - Qualified Energy Resources (Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act)
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0301 (HB0699)
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0313 /CH0365 (HB0410/CH0364)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0926 (HB1548)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Property
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0942 (HB1512)
Title
Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980 (HB1461)
Title
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1146 (HB1414/CH0393)
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1158 /CH0372
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0410 /CH0364 (SB0313/CH0365) Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 364
Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0442 Volkswagen Settlement Funds - Use of Environmental Mitigation Trust Delegate Robinson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0514 /CH0780 (SB0184/CH0014) Energy Efficiency Programs - Calculation of Program Savings and Consideration of Cost-Effectiveness Delegate Jameson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Economic Matters
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0699 (SB0301) Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0863 State Agricultural and Conservation Property Interests - Solar Facilities (Right to Solar Farm) Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0867 Natural Resources - State-Owned Land - Wind Facilities Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0970 Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Solar Energy Grant Program - Energy Storage Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1414 /CH0393 (SB1146) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1457 Public Utilities - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Revisions Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1512 (SB0942) Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1543 Task Force to Study the Feasibility of Installing Solar Panels on Baltimore City Public Schools Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1548 (SB0926) Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Property Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0174 Income Tax Credit - Clean Energy Production - Qualified Energy Resources (Maryland Clean Energy Incentive Act) Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0301 (HB0699) Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0313 /CH0365 (HB0410/CH0364) Economic Development - Maryland Energy Innovation Institute President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Appropriations
SB0926 (HB1548) Income Tax Credit - Renewable Energy Property Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0942 (HB1512) Labor and Employment - Clean Energy Workforce Account - Establishment Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 (HB1461) Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1146 (HB1414/CH0393) Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Study Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1158 /CH0372 Department of Natural Resources - Solar Generation Facilities - Pollinator-Friendly Designation Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM