Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680 /CH0632 (SB0566)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on Highways
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0778 /CH0332 (SB0899/CH0331)
Title
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 (SB0621/CH0066)
Title
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1248
Title
Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company Member
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0680/CH0632)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on Highways
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0587 /CH0503
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 /CH0066 (HB0889)
Title
Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0899 /CH0331 (HB0778/CH0332)
Title
Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0680 /CH0632 (SB0566) Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on Highways Delegate Hogan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0778 /CH0332 (SB0899/CH0331) Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Delegate Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0889 (SB0621/CH0066) Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts Delegate Malone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1117 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1248 Workers' Compensation - Average Weekly Wage - Volunteer Company Member Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 (HB0680/CH0632) Vehicle Laws - Unregistered Emergency Vehicles - Operating on Highways Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0587 /CH0503 Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship Senator Garagiola 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 503
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0621 /CH0066 (HB0889) Vehicles Laws - Emergency Vehicles - Motorcades and Escorts Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 66
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0899 /CH0331 (HB0778/CH0332) Local Government - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Funds - Distribution Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM