Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 /CH0360 (SB0214)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562 /CH0434 (SB0869)
Title
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0898
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose
Sponsor
Delegate Bromwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948 (SB0473)
Title
Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding Allocation
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214 (HB0368/CH0360)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0473 (HB0948)
Title
Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding Allocation
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0546 /CH0359
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0869 (HB0562/CH0434)
Title
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 /CH0489 (SB0057) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0368 /CH0360 (SB0214) Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose Delegate Beidle 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 360
Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0562 /CH0434 (SB0869) Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0898 Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose Delegate Bromwell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 (SB0473) Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding Allocation Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 Health Occupations - Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1219 Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil County Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0214 (HB0368/CH0360) Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose Anne Arundel County Senators 6 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0473 (HB0948) Baltimore County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Companies - Funding Allocation Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0546 /CH0359 Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug Overdose Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0869 (HB0562/CH0434) Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement - Repeal of Termination Date Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM