Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Ambulances -see also- Emergency Med Services; Rescue Squads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0293 /CH0622 (SB0204/CH0623)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Company or Volunteer Ambulance Company License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087 (SB0871)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0074 /CH0147
Title
Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204 /CH0623 (HB0293/CH0622)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Company or Volunteer Ambulance Company License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0837
Title
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1087)
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0293 /CH0622 (SB0204/CH0623) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Company or Volunteer Ambulance Company License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1087 (SB0871) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 Vehicle Laws - Move Over Safety Monitoring System - Authorization Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0074 /CH0147 Higher Education - Charles W. Riley Firefighter and Ambulance and Rescue Squad Member Scholarship - Alterations Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2019 - 3:30 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 /CH0623 (HB0293/CH0622) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Volunteer Fire Company or Volunteer Ambulance Company License Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 623
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0837 Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - Authorization Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1087) Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM