Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Amusement Parks and Carnivals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB1036)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Jalisi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1418)
Title
Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB1304)
Title
Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0777 Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - Prohibition Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 (SB1036) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Delegate Jalisi 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 (HB1418) Public Health - Auto-Injectable Epinephrine - Certification for Emergency Administration Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 (HB1304) Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in Public - Penalty Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM