Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Amusement Parks and Carnivals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0008
Title
Business Regulation - Amusement Attractions - Maryland Rider Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0509 (SB0157)
Title
Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0330/CH0523)
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157 (HB0509)
Title
Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 /CH0523 (HB1244)
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534
Title
Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0008 Business Regulation - Amusement Attractions - Maryland Rider Safety Act Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0509 (SB0157) Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1244 (SB0330/CH0523) Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
SB0157 (HB0509) Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/07/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0330 /CH0523 (HB1244) Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0534 Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM