Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Annapolis

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Shiplap House
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0110)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House Restoration
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0145 /CH0215 (SB0244/CH0214)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766 /CH0139
Title
Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305 /CH0675
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358 (SB0663)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1458 (SB0999)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's Street
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Shiplap House
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0092
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Sprinkler Assistance Revolving Fund
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0110 (HB0084)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244 /CH0214 (HB0145/CH0215)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB1358)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 (HB1458)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's Street
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Shiplap House Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0084 (SB0110) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House Restoration Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
HB0094 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2006 - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's Museum Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0145 /CH0215 (SB0244/CH0214) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0766 /CH0139 Environment - Severn River Watershed - Silt and Erosion Control - Certification Delegate Frush 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1305 /CH0675 City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1358 (SB0663) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1458 (SB0999) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's Street Delegate Busch 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0091 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Anne Arundel County - Shiplap House Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0092 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Sprinkler Assistance Revolving Fund Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0110 (HB0084) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - William Paca House Restoration Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
SB0244 /CH0214 (HB0145/CH0215) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container License Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0663 (HB1358) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Camp Woodlands Teepee Project Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0999 (HB1458) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Recreational Center at 9 St. Mary's Street Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM