Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Annapolis

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0269 (SB0242)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan House
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0420 (SB0089)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881 (SB0256)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - James Brice House
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0089 (HB0447/CH0420)
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0269)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan House
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0256 (HB0881)
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Taylor Avenue Improvements
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis City Dock Flood Mitigation Project
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0269 (SB0242) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan House Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 AM
HB0447 /CH0420 (SB0089) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0881 (SB0256) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - James Brice House Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2015 - 9:00 AM
SB0089 (HB0447/CH0420) City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Election Days Senator Astle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0242 (HB0269) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan House Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 11:00 AM
SB0256 (HB0881) Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0768 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Taylor Avenue Improvements Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 11:00 AM
SB0769 Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis City Dock Flood Mitigation Project Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2015 - 11:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page