Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Annapolis

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0674 (SB0426/CH0673)
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0009 (HB1590)
Title
Anne Arundel County and the City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426 /CH0673 (HB0383/CH0674)
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 /CH0419
Title
City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft Beer
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0383 /CH0674 (SB0426/CH0673) Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis Delegate Busch 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0009 (HB1590) Anne Arundel County and the City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Senator Reilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0426 /CH0673 (HB0383/CH0674) Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis Senator Astle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0649 /CH0419 City of Annapolis - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft Beer Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:31 PM
Click to return on the top page