Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Annotated Code of Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0251 (SB0785)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0562
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0827)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733 /CH0136
Title
Local Government - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789 (SB0715/CH0309)
Title
Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 /CH0674
Title
Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0283 /CH0042
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0043
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253)
Title
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB0251)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0660)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0251 (SB0785) Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0562 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate Delegate Elliott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0660 (SB0827) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0733 /CH0136 Local Government - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0789 (SB0715/CH0309) Maryland Highway Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1253 (SB0662/CH0519) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1257 /CH0674 Land Use - Clarifications and Corrections Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 674
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1366 Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0283 /CH0042 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0284 /CH0043 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Rules
1/30/2013 - 10:45 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0662 /CH0519 (HB1253) Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - Licensing Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 (HB0251) Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB0660) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM