Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Annotated Code of Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0046 (SB0275)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0094
Title
General Provisions Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0327
Title
Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate
Sponsor
Delegate Elliott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 (SB0893/CH0355)
Title
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 /CH0104
Title
General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999 /CH0106
Title
Code Revision - Miscellaneous Provisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 /CH0445
Title
Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Garrett County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 /CH0044
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0184 /CH0045
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275 (HB0046)
Title
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0606 /CH0539
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Deputy Secretary - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 /CH0355 (HB0823)
Title
Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935
Title
Department of Natural Resources Police - Transfer of Duties and Responsibilities to the Department of State Police
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645)
Title
Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0046 (SB0275) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0270 /CH0094 General Provisions Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0327 Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate Delegate Elliott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0551 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Repeal Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 State Government - Legislative and Regulatory Procedures - Efficacy Analyses Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0823 (SB0893/CH0355) Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 /CH0104 General Provisions - Cross-References and Corrections Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0999 /CH0106 Code Revision - Miscellaneous Provisions Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1097 /CH0445 Garrett County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Sales for On-Premises Consumption Garrett County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445
Economic Matters
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1205 /CH0645 (SB0993) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1229 Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Repeal - Transfer of Enrollees to Federal Health Insurance Marketplace Delegate Hough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2014 - 12:30 PM
SB0183 /CH0044 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 44
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0184 /CH0045 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0275 (HB0046) State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0606 /CH0539 Developmental Disabilities Administration - Deputy Secretary - Establishment Senator Robey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 539
Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0893 /CH0355 (HB0823) Health Insurance - Insurance Laws That Apply to Health Maintenance Organizations - Consolidation and Clarification Chair, Finance Committee 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 355
Finance
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0935 Department of Natural Resources Police - Transfer of Duties and Responsibilities to the Department of State Police Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0993 (HB1205/CH0645) Frederick County - Transition to Charter Government - Corrections to References in the Annotated Code of Maryland Senator Brinkley 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM