Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Annotated Code of Maryland

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878
Title
Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1430
Title
Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243)
Title
21st Century School Facilities Act
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012
Title
Motor Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Single Registration Plate Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0065
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 /CH0011
Title
Annual Curative Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0812 /CH0012
Title
Annual Corrective Bill
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0878 Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018) Delegate Robinson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/05/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1430 Health Occupations - Podiatric Physicians Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1783 /CH0014 (SB1243) 21st Century School Facilities Act Delegate Jones 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 14
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0012 Motor Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Single Registration Plate Requirement Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0065 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0811 /CH0011 Annual Curative Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 11
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0812 /CH0012 Annual Corrective Bill President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 12
Rules
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM