Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 (SB0018)
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677 /CH0135
Title
Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050 (SB0221)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior Apartments
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 /CH0410 (SB0902)
Title
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1433 /CH0685
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018 (HB0469)
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0221 (HB1050)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior Apartments
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625
Title
Real Property - Dwellings Rented to Individuals at Least 55 Years Old - Air-Conditioning Systems
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB1279/CH0410)
Title
Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595)
Title
Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1049 /CH0602
Title
Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0469 (SB0018) Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0511 Sales and Use Tax - Energy for Residential Use - Exemption Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0676 Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0677 /CH0135 Montgomery County - Property Tax Credit for Qualified Enterprise Zone Property - Glenmont MC 18-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1050 (SB0221) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior Apartments Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB1279 /CH0410 (SB0902) Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 410
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1413 /CH0595 (SB0969/CH0594) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1433 /CH0685 Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 685
Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0018 (HB0469) Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Failed (21-25)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0221 (HB1050) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior Apartments Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0625 Real Property - Dwellings Rented to Individuals at Least 55 Years Old - Air-Conditioning Systems Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB1279/CH0410) Statewide Building Codes - Maryland Accessibility Code - Enforcement Senator Muse 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (99-37)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
SB0969 /CH0594 (HB1413/CH0595) Public Safety - Fire Protection and Prevention - Residential Smoke Alarms Senator Glassman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1049 /CH0602 Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM