Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0304)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior Apartments
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900 (SB0663)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest House
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0947 /CH0495
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075 /CH0639
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of Process
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0304 (HB0317)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior Apartments
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0494
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663 (HB0900)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest House
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0317 (SB0304) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior Apartments Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0900 (SB0663) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest House Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2014 - 10:30 AM
HB0947 /CH0495 Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 495
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1075 /CH0639 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Definitions PG/MC 106-14 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 639
Environmental Matters
3/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1077 Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of Process Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0304 (HB0317) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - University Gardens Senior Apartments Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 10:00 AM
SB0401 /CH0494 Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Railing Inspections (Jonathan's Law) Senator Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 494
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 (HB0900) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Homecrest House Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2014 - 9:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM