Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Apartments

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0261 /CH0534
Title
Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property Manager
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0592 /CH0537 (SB0915)
Title
Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 (SB0175)
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948
Title
Senior Apartment Housing Facilities - Baltimore City - Security Guard Services
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175 (HB0600)
Title
Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408
Title
Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0759
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Accessibility Design Features - Newly Constructed Apartment Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0915 (HB0592/CH0537)
Title
Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0261 /CH0534 Public Utilities - Termination of Service to Multifamily Dwelling Unit - Notification to Property Owner or Property Manager Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 534
Economic Matters
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0592 /CH0537 (SB0915) Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 (SB0175) Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 Senior Apartment Housing Facilities - Baltimore City - Security Guard Services Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
SB0175 (HB0600) Public Health - Use of Medical Oxygen in Residential Dwellings - Smoking and Open Flame Restrictions Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0408 Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of Violence Senator Robinson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0759 Property Tax - Credit for Accessibility Design Features - Newly Constructed Apartment Buildings Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0915 (HB0592/CH0537) Real Property Tax - Assessment Appeals Process - Dwellings Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM