Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appraisals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Home Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876 /CH0194 (SB0736/CH0193)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0176
Title
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0736 /CH0193 (HB0876/CH0194)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1106 /CH0079
Title
Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0366 Home Act of 2014 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0876 /CH0194 (SB0736/CH0193) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB0025 State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0176 Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real Property Senator Glassman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0736 /CH0193 (HB0876/CH0194) Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Historic or Heritage Properties - Calculation Senator Jones-Rodwell 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 193
Budget and Taxation
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1106 /CH0079 Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Criminal History Records Checks Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 79
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM