Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appraisals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064 /CH0759
Title
Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 /CH0160 (SB0064/CH0159)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1245 /CH0789
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1566 /CH0219 (SB0854/CH0220)
Title
Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0159 (HB0200/CH0160)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0220 (HB1566/CH0219)
Title
Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0064 /CH0759 Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 759
Economic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 /CH0160 (SB0064/CH0159) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1245 /CH0789 Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 789
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1566 /CH0219 (SB0854/CH0220) Public Utilities - Water and Sewage Disposal Companies - Acquisition Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Economic Matters
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0159 (HB0200/CH0160) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0854 /CH0220 (HB1566/CH0219) Public Utilities – Water and Sewage Disposal Companies – Acquisition Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM