Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Appraisals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020 /CH0086
Title
Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0089
Title
Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
SB0020 /CH0086 Appraisal Management Companies - Notice and Response Requirements for Violations - Repeal of Exception Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Finance
1/10/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0069 /CH0089 Appraisal Management Companies – Annual Fee and Reports Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Finance
1/10/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:17 PM