Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Appraisals

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 (SB0148)
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 /CH0618 (SB0421/CH0619)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 /CH0531
Title
Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0148 (HB0125)
Title
Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0421 /CH0619 (HB0735/CH0618)
Title
Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 (SB0148) Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements Delegate Healey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0735 /CH0618 (SB0421/CH0619) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 618
Appropriations
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0117 /CH0531 Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 531
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0148 (HB0125) Board of Public Works - Land Acquisition - Requirements Senator Young 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0421 /CH0619 (HB0735/CH0618) Task Force on the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority - Reestablishment Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/9/2020 1:19 PM